KY HB473 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 112)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 112)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 15.404 to set the basic training of peace officers as that found in KRS 15.440; amend KRS 15.440 to set the local government qualifications for participating in the KLEFP fund at 928 hours as set by the Kentucky Law Enforcement Council and to require any change of those hours to be done by administrative regulation, and allow the council to approve schools that may require more hours of education; amend KRS 70.263, relating to deputy sheriff merit boards, to conform to amended hour requirement; amend KRS 95.955, relating to municipal police and auxiliary police, to conform to the amended hour requirement; amend KRS 15.530, relating to telecommunicators, to set the required training hours; amend KRS 15.550 to conform to the set number of training hours for the basic course; amend KRS 15.560 to set the required training hours for non-CJIS telecommunicators; amend KRS 15.565 to prohibit the Kentucky Law Enforcement Council from changing the 8 hours of in-service training for telecommunicators; amend KRS 15.590 to allow the council to set the number of hours for training at a different number than that established by statute for non-CJIS telecommunicators and the telecommunications academy; amend KRS 15A.070, relating to Department of Criminal Justice Training powers, to conform to training requirements; amend KRS 95A.230 to set the basic training course at 400 hours and in-service training at 100 hours, but let the commission reduce the number of hours by administrative regulation, and allow a different number of hours to be set at a school recognized by the commission; amend KRS 95A.240 to establish the protocols for the commission relative to setting the number of hours for basic and in-service training, as well as the requirement for volunteer firefighters and departments under KRS 95A.262; amend KRS 95A.262 to conform with training requirement.
Title
AN ACT relating to public safety personnel training.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 112) |
2016-04-01 | House | delivered to Governor |
2016-04-01 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-04-01 | House | received in House |
2016-03-29 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | placed in the Consent Orders #1 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | taken from the Consent Orders #2 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2016 (Consent Orders #2) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-22 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-03-14 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-09 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2016-03-07 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 9, 2016 |
2016-03-03 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-02 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-02-29 | House | posted in committee |
2016-02-24 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2016-02-23 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB473.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB473/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB473/vote_history.pdf |