KY HB449 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 160.180 to provide additional types of evidence permitted to document a board of education candidate's completion of twelfth grade; remove specifications for the topics of required trainings for board of education members.
Title
AN ACT relating to local boards of education.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Riley [R] | Rep. Myron Dossett [R] | Rep. Kevin Jackson [R] | Rep. Scott Lewis [R] |
Rep. Timmy Truett [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 489 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/FINAL fccr RSN# 3236 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 sfa2 RSN# 3111 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 220 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/FINAL fccr RSN# 3236 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 sfa2 RSN# 3111 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 220 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | signed by Governor |
2024-04-15 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-04-15 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-04-15 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-04-15 | House | passed 94-0 |
2024-04-15 | House | Free Conference Committee report adopted in House |
2024-04-15 | House | posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Report |
2024-04-15 | House | to Rules (H) |
2024-04-15 | House | received in House |
2024-04-15 | Senate | passed 37-0 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report adopted in Senate |
2024-04-15 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Committee Report (1) |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report (1) filed in House and Senate |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Free Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted in House and Senate |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Conference Committee report (1) filed in House and Senate |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed in Senate |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from Floor Amendment (2) |
2024-04-12 | Senate | posted for passage for receding from Senate Floor Amendment (2) for Monday, April 15, 2024 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2024-04-12 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-04-12 | House | Conference Committee appointed in House |
2024-04-12 | House | House refused to concur in Senate Floor Amendment (2) |
2024-04-12 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-28 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (2) |
2024-03-28 | House | to Rules (H) |
2024-03-28 | House | received in House |
2024-03-27 | Senate | passed 35-1 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (2) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Floor Amendment (1) withdrawn |
2024-03-27 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2024-03-26 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-26 | Senate | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2024-03-25 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 26, 2024 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2024-03-21 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2024-03-21 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-06 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-05 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 06, 2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-27 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-08 | House | to Education (H) |
2024-02-01 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-01 | House | introduced in House |