KY HB259 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 181)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 181)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 16.052 to increase state trooper salaries.
Title
AN ACT relating to employees of the Kentucky State Police and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 517 (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2324 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 120 (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2324 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 120 (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 181) |
2022-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-30 | House | passed 92-1 |
2022-03-30 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (2) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-30 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (2) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-30 | House | taken from Rules |
2022-03-30 | House | to Rules (H) |
2022-03-30 | House | received in House |
2022-03-30 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (2) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 30, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitutes (1) and (2) and Committee Amendment (1-title) as a consent bill |
2022-03-23 | Senate | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 23, 2022 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2022-03-16 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-02-11 | House | 3rd reading, passed 87-2 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-02-09 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 10, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-08 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-01-18 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2022-01-10 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-10 | House | introduced in House |