KY HB253 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-11 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-11 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 189.456 to require that the information contained on disabled parking placards is written on a tamper-evident sticker that is color coded based upon the year in which the placard expires; amend KRS 189.990 to increase the fine for a violation of KRS.189.459 to $500 and to require that 75% of the fine collected be forwarded to the personal care assistance program and 25% of the fine collected be returned to the law enforcement agencies in the county where the violation occurred.
Title
AN ACT relating to disabled parking and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-11 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-27 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2013-02-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 with Committee Substitute |
2013-02-20 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 22, 2013 |
2013-02-20 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-19 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2013-02-14 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-07 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2013-02-06 | House | introduced in House |