KY HB248 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 101)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 101)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amends KRS 95.440 to remove the requirement that a person shall be eligible for reinstatement to a police or fire department only within one year following separation from employment.
Title
AN ACT relating to reinstatement of police and fire department employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3130 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 163 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 163 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 101) |
2024-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-28 | House | received in House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-26 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-25 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 26, 2024 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2024-03-21 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2024-03-11 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-02-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2024-02-26 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 27, 2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-02-01 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H) |
2024-01-11 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-11 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Counties, Urban
Firefighters and Fire Departments
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Personnel and Employment
Police, City and County
Firefighters and Fire Departments
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Personnel and Employment
Police, City and County