KY HB232 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 88)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 88)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 44.001 to define terms; amend KRS 44.030 to provide that monetary claims against the state shall be offset if the claimant is indebted to the state or any local government, if the local government provides necessary information concerning the debt; provide that monetary claims against any local government shall similarly be offset if the claimant is indebted to the state; amend KRS 45.237 to define terms; provide that a local government may, in certain circumstances, refer debts to the Department of Revenue for collection action as state agencies currently do; amend KRS 45.238 to provide terms and conditions for the collection of local government debts by the department; amend KRS 45.241 to make conforming changes relating to referral of liquidated debts to the department for collection; amend KRS 131.030 to grant the department the powers necessary to collect local government debts; make technical corrections; amend KRS 131.565 to allow for the offset of individual income tax refunds if the claimant is indebted to a local government; amend KRS 131.570 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to debts owed to local governments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 88) |
2013-03-12 | House | delivered to Governor |
2013-03-12 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2013-03-12 | House | received in House |
2013-03-07 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2013 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-03-05 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2013-02-21 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-02-15 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 |
2013-02-15 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2013-02-14 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2013 |
2013-02-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-11 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-06 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2013-02-05 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB232.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB232/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB232/vote_history.pdf |