KY HB210 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 76)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 76)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 337.015 to require employers to provide the same leave policies to adoptive parents as they provide to birth parents; change the applicable age of an adoptive child from seven to ten; create an exemption for specified categories of adoption.
Title
AN ACT related to adoption leave.
Sponsors
Rep. Samara Heavrin [R] | Rep. David Meade [R] | Rep. Tina Bojanowski [D] | Rep. David Hale [R] |
Rep. DJ Johnson [R] | Rep. Kim King [R] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] |
Rep. Melinda Prunty [R] | Rep. Josie Raymond [D] | Rep. Steve Sheldon [R] | Rep. Nancy Tate [R] |
Rep. Killian Timoney [R] | Rep. Billy Wesley [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1713 (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 112 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 112 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 76) |
2021-03-15 | House | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-15 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-15 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-12 | House | received in House |
2021-03-12 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 33-2 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 12, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill |
2021-03-04 | Senate | returned to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2021-03-04 | Senate | taken from Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | returned to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 1st reading |
2021-03-03 | Senate | taken from Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2021-03-01 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-02-24 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 |
2021-02-22 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 23, 2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-02-04 | House | posted in committee |
2021-01-13 | House | to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H) |
2021-01-07 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-07 | House | introduced in House |