CA SB532 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 22508 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parking payment zones.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB532 Wiener et al (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2).
2024-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2024-06-25AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2024-06-17AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2024-06-17AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended.
2024-06-13AssemblyRe-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2024-06-10AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2023-07-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-06-29AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2023-06-22AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2023-06-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2023-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2023-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 1393.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2023-05-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-18SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2023-05-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1174.) (May 18).
2023-05-12SenateSet for hearing May 18.
2023-05-08SenateMay 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2023-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2023-04-25SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 792.) (April 18).
2023-04-13SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2023-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2023-04-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 683.) (April 12).
2023-03-30SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2023-03-23SenateSet for hearing April 12.
2023-03-21SenateMarch 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2023-03-14SenateSet for hearing March 29.
2023-02-22SenateReferred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E. & C.A.
2023-02-15SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
2023-02-14SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code22508Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB532
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB532#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB532#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB532#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB532#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB532#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB532#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB532#93AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB532#92AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB532#91AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB532#90AMD
Roll Callhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB532

Bill Comments

feedback