KY HB187 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-09 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-09 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 186 to create an I Support Veterans special license plate; amend KRS 186.162 to establish the fees for the I Support Veterans special license plate; amend KRS 186.166 to require the I Support Veterans license plate to be perpetually produced.
Title
AN ACT relating to special license plates and making an appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-09 | signed by Governor | |
2011-02-28 | delivered to Governor | |
2011-02-28 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2011-02-28 | received in House | |
2011-02-28 | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 | |
2011-02-28 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 28, 2011 | |
2011-02-24 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-23 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-14 | to Transportation (S) | |
2011-02-10 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-09 | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 with floor amendment (1) | |
2011-02-07 | floor amendment (1) filed | |
2011-02-07 | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day | |
2011-02-03 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 8, 2011 | |
2011-02-03 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-02 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-01-07 | posted in committee | |
2011-01-06 | to Military Affairs & Public Safety (H) | |
2011-01-05 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB187.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB187/bill.doc |