KY HB182 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 56)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 56)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 157.350 to allow, under certain conditions, SEEK funding to be distributed to schools who employ teachers who reside outside the district boundary but whose children attend the district in which the teacher is employed; waive nonresident tuition fees; amend KRS 158.120 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to school funding.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 56) |
2013-03-11 | House | delivered to Governor |
2013-03-11 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2013-03-11 | House | passed 96-0 |
2013-03-11 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute |
2013-03-07 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute for Monday, March 11, 2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | received in House |
2013-03-06 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute |
2013-03-06 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 6, 2013 |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-28 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2013-02-26 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2013-02-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-02-21 | House | 3rd reading, passed 100-0 with Committee Substitute |
2013-02-19 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 21, 2013 |
2013-02-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2013-02-06 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-06 | House | to Education (H) |
2013-02-05 | House | introduced in House |