KY HB179 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-09 - to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H)
Pending: House Economic Development & Workforce Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-09 - to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H)
Pending: House Economic Development & Workforce Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 337.420 to define "equivalent jobs" as those that are equal under the federal Equal Pay Act, or jobs that are dissimilar but equivalent in skill, effort, responsibility, and working conditions; amend KRS 337.423 to prohibit wage discrimination on the basis of sex, race, or national origin by prohibiting wage differentials for employees who perform equivalent jobs; provide exceptions for wage differentials based on seniority or merit systems, systems that measure wages by quantity or quality of production, and factors other than sex, race, or national origin; amend KRS 337.425 to require the promulgation of administrative regulations to specify criteria for determining jobs that are dominated by employees of a particular sex, race, or national origin, and acceptable methodology for determining equivalent skill, effort, responsibility, and working conditions; require that the promulgation occur on or before July 1, 2018; EFFECTIVE IN PART July 1, 2019.
Title
AN ACT relating to wages.
Sponsors
Rep. Sannie Overly [D] | Rep. Kelly Flood [D] | Rep. Rocky Adkins [D] | Rep. George Brown [D] |
Rep. Thomas Burch [D] | Rep. Will Coursey [D] | Rep. Jeffery Donohue [D] | Rep. Alan Gentry [D] |
Rep. Dennis Keene [D] | Rep. Mary Marzian [D] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] | Rep. Dean Schamore [D] |
Rep. Attica Scott [D] | Rep. John Sims [D] | Rep. Wilson Stone [D] | Rep. Jim Wayne [D] |
Rep. Susan Westrom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | House | to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H) |
2017-02-07 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/HB179.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/HB179/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/17RS/HB179/LM.pdf |