KS SB94 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 4, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 4, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a minimum course duration for motor vehicle accident prevention courses.
Title
Establishing a minimum course duration for motor vehicle accident prevention courses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 120 Nay: 4 (Y: 120 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 4, 2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 2, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 120 Nay: 4 |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2019-03-15 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation |
2019-03-13 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2019-02-28 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-28 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 19, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate Introduced |