KS SB78 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Elections; voting place changes; written notice to affected voters; emergency exception.
Title
Elections; voting place changes; written notice to affected voters; emergency exception.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2017-03-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Elections |
2017-03-15 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 15, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 281-N |
2017-02-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Elections |
2017-02-23 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 08, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 142-S |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senate Introduced |