KS SB37 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Hoheisel, Representative Clifford and Representative Xu appointed as conferees
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Hoheisel, Representative Clifford and Representative Xu appointed as conferees
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for SB 37 by Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions - Enacting the countries of concern divestment and procurement protection act, requiring state-managed funds to divest from investments with countries of concern, with exceptions, prohibiting state deposits in any bank domiciled in a country of concern and state contracts for final or finished goods or services with a foreign principal, indemnifying state-managed funds with respect to actions taken in compliance with such act and providing an expiration date for such act.
Title
House Substitute for SB 37 by Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions - Enacting the countries of concern divestment and procurement protection act, requiring state-managed funds to divest from investments with countries of concern, with exceptions, prohibiting state deposits in any bank domiciled in a country of concern and state contracts for final or finished goods or services with a foreign principal, indemnifying state-managed funds with respect to actions taken in compliance with such act and providing an expiration date for such act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 85 Nay: 38 (Y: 85 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 35 Nay: 4 (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 35 Nay: 4 (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Hoheisel, Representative Clifford and Representative Xu appointed as conferees |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Longbine , Senator Fagg and Senator Pittman as conferees |
2024-03-27 | House | House Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 85 Nay: 38 |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2024-03-14 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions |
2023-03-15 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 15, 2023, 9:00 AM Room 582-N |
2023-03-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions |
2023-03-01 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 35 Nay: 4 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 8, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Assessment and Taxation; Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Senate Introduced |