KS SB344 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, 17 April 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, 17 April 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Special permits, oversized loads, transportation of hay or feed stuffs.
Title
Special permits, oversized loads, transportation of hay or feed stuffs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, 17 April 2014 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 11, 2014 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2014-03-26 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Proehl, Representative Ryckman Sr. and Representative Perry appointed as conferees |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Petersen , Senator Wolf and Senator Pettey as conferees |
2014-03-25 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 1 |
2014-03-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2014-03-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2014-03-07 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 11, 2014, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2014-02-27 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-02-27 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senate Introduced |