KS SB301 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring hunting guides and outfitters to register with the department of wildlife, parks and tourism.
Title
Requiring hunting guides and outfitters to register with the department of wildlife, parks and tourism.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 31 Nay: 9 (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2018-03-27 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2018-03-27 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 31 Nay: 9 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 08, 2018, 08:30 AM Room 159-S |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senate Introduced |