KS SB143 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Updating definitions and increasing maximum functional unit license and storage fees relating to grain and public warehouse laws.
Title
Updating definitions and increasing maximum functional unit license and storage fees relating to grain and public warehouse laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 33 Nay: 6 (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 115 Nay: 8 (Y: 115 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 5 (Y: 117 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 30 Nay: 9 (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 115 Nay: 8 (Y: 115 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 5 (Y: 117 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 30 Nay: 9 (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 16, 2021 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 33 Nay: 6 |
2021-04-08 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 115 Nay: 8 |
2021-04-08 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2021-04-06 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Rahjes, Representative Smith, E. and Representative Carlin appointed as conferees |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Kerschen , Senator Straub and Senator Ware as conferees |
2021-03-25 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 5 |
2021-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-03-24 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture |
2021-03-22 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 22, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2021-03-10 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2021-03-10 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 30 Nay: 9 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 24, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 144-S |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate Introduced |