KS HB2766 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the creative industries commission; abolishing the art commission and the film commission.
Title
Creating the creative industries commission; abolishing the art commission and the film commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 118 Nay: 4 (Y: 118 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in Senate Committee | |
2012-03-26 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2012-03-21 | Received and Introduced | |
2012-03-21 | Engrossed on Wednesday, 21 March 2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 118 Nay: 4 | |
2012-03-20 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2012-03-20 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2012-03-15 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education Budget | |
2012-02-29 | Hearing: Thursday, March 08, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 159-S | |
2012-02-23 | Referred to Committee on Education Budget | |
2012-02-22 | Introduced |