KS HB2503 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Approved by Governor on Friday, 25 May 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Approved by Governor on Friday, 25 May 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Agricultural boards and advisory bodies, membership and responsibilities; update of references relating to ERO No. 40 and Department of Agriculture.
Title
Agricultural boards and advisory bodies, membership and responsibilities; update of references relating to ERO No. 40 and Department of Agriculture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-11 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 118 Nay: 4 (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Approved by Governor on Friday, 25 May 2012 | |
2012-06-01 | Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, May 21, 2012 | |
2012-05-16 | Reengrossed on Tuesday, 15 May 2012 | |
2012-05-11 | Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 118 Nay: 4 | |
2012-05-11 | Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; | |
2012-04-25 | Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 38 Nay: 1 | |
2012-04-25 | Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; | |
2012-04-25 | Conference committee report now available | |
2012-03-27 | Motion to accede adopted; Senator Taddiken, Senator Teichman and Senator Francisco appointed as conferees | |
2012-03-21 | Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Powell , Representative Kerschen and Representative Williams as conferees | |
2012-03-20 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 | |
2012-03-19 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2012-03-19 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2012-03-15 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture | |
2012-03-07 | Hearing: Tuesday, March 13, 2012, 7:30 AM Room 159-S | |
2012-02-15 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture | |
2012-02-14 | Received and Introduced | |
2012-02-14 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 | |
2012-02-13 | Engrossed on Friday, 10 February 2012 | |
2012-02-10 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2012-02-10 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2012-02-03 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-25 | Hearing: Thursday, January 26, 2012, 9:00 AM Room 783 Docking | |
2012-01-25 | Hearing: Wednesday, January 25, 2012, 9:00 AM Room 783 Docking | |
2012-01-24 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-23 | Introduced |