KS HB2338 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designating sickle cell disease awareness week and requiring KDHE to study and report on topics related to sickle cell disease.
Title
Designating sickle cell disease awareness week and requiring KDHE to study and report on topics related to sickle cell disease.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 14, 2023, 8:30 AM Room 142-S |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2023-02-23 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0 |
2023-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2023-02-21 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Health and Human Services |
2023-02-20 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 20, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 112-N |
2023-02-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2023-02-07 | House | House Introduced |