IN SR0052 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Second reading: adopted voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Second reading: adopted voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A SENATE RESOLUTION urging the legislative council to assign to the appropriate committee the topic of an examination of the need, if any, to provide continued state funding to solid waste management districts.
Title
A SENATE RESOLUTION urging the legislative council to assign to the appropriate committee the topic of an examination of the need, if any, to provide continued state funding to solid waste management districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brown L |