IN SCR0034 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 37-13)
Status: Passed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 37-13)
Status: Passed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Gov. to designate March 30th Welcome Home Vietnam Veteran's Day.
Title
Urging Gov. to designate March 30th Welcome Home Vietnam Veteran's Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Returned to the Senate | |
2012-03-09 | First reading: adopted voice vote | |
2012-03-07 | Senators Alting, Arnold, Banks, Becker, Boots, Bray, Breaux, Broden, Buck, Charbonneau, Delph, Eckerty, Gard, Glick, Grooms, Head, Hershman, Holdman, Hume, Kenley, Kruse, Lanane, Landske, Lawson, Leising, Long, Mishler, Mrvan, Nugent, Paul, Randolph, Rogers, Schneider, Simpson, Skinner, Smith, Steele, Tallian, Taylor, Tomes, Walker, Waltz, Waterman, Yoder, R. Young, M. Young and Zakas added as coauthors | |
2012-03-07 | Cosponsor: Rep. McMillin | |
2012-03-07 | House sponsor: Rep. M. Smith | |
2012-03-07 | Referred to the House | |
2012-03-07 | Second reading: adopted voice vote | |
2012-03-06 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-03-05 | Senator Miller added as coauthor | |
2012-03-05 | Senator Wyss added as second author | |
2012-03-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation and Veterans Affairs | |
2012-03-05 | Authored by Senator Merritt |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2012&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SCR&docno=0034 |
Text | http://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/SRESF/SC0034.html |