IN SB0402 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies the membership of the Indiana uniform law commission (commission), which is the Indiana delegation of the National Conference of Commissioners on Uniform State Laws (NCCUSL). Specifies the commission is to work with the NCCUSL to research, draft, and promote the enactment of uniform state laws in areas of state law where uniformity is desirable and practical. Provides for the reimbursement of expenses incurred by commission members in attending the annual meeting of the NCCUSL.
Title
Indiana uniform law commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-09 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-06 | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 317: yeas 47, nays 0 | |
2012-03-01 | Motion to concur in House amendments filed | |
2012-02-27 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2012-02-27 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 251: yeas 92, nays 4 | |
2012-02-23 | Amendment 1 (Pierce), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-02-23 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-21 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-31 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-01-24 | House sponsor: Rep. Foley | |
2012-01-24 | Referred to the House | |
2012-01-24 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 76: yeas 50 and nays 0 | |
2012-01-23 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-19 | Senator Randolph added as coauthor | |
2012-01-19 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-17 | Senator Bray added as second author | |
2012-01-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-01-09 | Authored by Senator Simpson |