IN SB0394 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Amendment #4 (Bacon) failed; voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Advanced practice registered nurses. Allows an advanced practice registered nurse who: (1) had primary responsibility for the treatment and care of a deceased individual for a period longer than six months; and (2) pronounced the time of death for the deceased individual; to certify a record on a death and enter the record into the Indiana death registration system. Specifies that at least two of the six registered nurse board members of the Indiana state board of nursing (board) be advanced practice registered nurses with at least one of these members having prescriptive authority. Specifies requirements of certain board members. Provides that an advanced practice registered nurse with prescriptive authority and who has operated under a practice agreement with a practitioner for at least three years may operate without a practice agreement if certain conditions are met. Amends the hospital governing board requirements for the manner in which an advanced practice registered nurse who operates in the hospital will interact with other practitioners. Requires the Indiana state board of nursing to prepare a report to the general assembly concerning advance practice registered nurses who practice without a practice agreement. Makes a conforming change.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Advanced practice registered nurses. Allows an advanced practice registered nurse who: (1) had primary responsibility for the treatment and care of a deceased individual for a period longer than six months; and (2) pronounced the time of death for the deceased individual; to certify a record on a death and enter the record into the Indiana death registration system. Specifies that at least two of the six registered nurse board members of the Indiana state board of nursing (board) be advanced practice registered nurses with at least one of these members having prescriptive authority. Specifies requirements of certain board members. Provides that an advanced practice registered nurse with prescriptive authority and who has operated under a practice agreement with a practitioner for at least three years may operate without a practice agreement if certain conditions are met. Amends the hospital governing board requirements for the manner in which an advanced practice registered nurse who operates in the hospital will interact with other practitioners. Requires the Indiana state board of nursing to prepare a report to the general assembly concerning advance practice registered nurses who practice without a practice agreement. Makes a conforming change.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseAmendment #4 (Bacon) failed; voice vote
2019-04-04HouseAmendment #3 (Mayfield) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-04HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-03-28HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-26HouseRepresentative Austin added as cosponsor
2019-03-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2019-02-13SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-12SenateSenator Raatz added as coauthor
2019-02-12SenateSenator Leising added as coauthor
2019-02-12SenateSenator Melton added as coauthor
2019-02-12SenateSenator Breaux added as coauthor
2019-02-12SenateSenator Ford J.D. removed as third author
2019-02-12SenateCosponsor: Representative Kirchhofer
2019-02-12SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Bacon
2019-02-12SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 111: yeas 43, nays 5
2019-02-11SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-07SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-05SenateSenator Rogers added as coauthor
2019-01-31SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateSenator Becker added as coauthor
2019-01-14SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as third author
2019-01-14SenateSenator Crider added as second author
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Charbonneau

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/394/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/7/1/9171ebaf/SB0394.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/f/4/7bf47e03/SB0394.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/b/a/8dba6799/SB0394.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/5/0/5/3505c719/SB0394.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/5/1/fc517cab/SB0394.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/4/9/5/2495b6bf/SB0394.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/9/6/7/c967b3a9/SB0394.04.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/8/0/1/e801b767/SB0394.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/a/0/8/0a08914c/SB0394.111.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/3/c/6/f3c62b24/SB0394.02.COMS.00.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback