IN SB0363 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Child molesting. Defines "dangerous sexually transmitted disease" and increases the penalty for child molesting from a Level 3 felony to: (1) a Level 2 felony if the offense results in the transmission of a dangerous sexually transmitted disease; and (2) a Level 1 felony if the offense results in the transmission of a dangerous sexually transmitted disease and the person knew or recklessly failed to know that the person was infected with the disease. Makes a technical correction.
Title
Child molesting. Defines "dangerous sexually transmitted disease" and increases the penalty for child molesting from a Level 3 felony to: (1) a Level 2 felony if the offense results in the transmission of a dangerous sexually transmitted disease; and (2) a Level 1 felony if the offense results in the transmission of a dangerous sexually transmitted disease and the person knew or recklessly failed to know that the person was infected with the disease. Makes a technical correction.
Sponsors
Sen. John Broden [D] | Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Patricia Miller [R] | Sen. Joseph Zakas [R] |
Rep. Dale DeVon [R] | Sen. David Niezgodski [D] | Rep. Christina Hale [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Representatives Niezgodski and Hale added as cosponsor |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Representative DeVon added as sponsor |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 125: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senator Zakas added as coauthor |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senator Miller, Pat added as coauthor |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Steele) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Senator Young, M. added as second author |
2015-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Broden |