IN SB0359 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 225
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Individualized mental health safety plans. Requires the division of mental health and addiction to establish a standard format for individualized mental health safety plans. Requires psychiatric crisis centers, psychiatric inpatient units, and psychiatric residential treatment providers to: (1) collaboratively develop a mental health safety plan with each patient; (2) explain the benefits of coordinating care and sharing mental health safety plans with mental health providers in the community that can help with the patient's safe transition back into the community; and (3) make a good faith effort before a patient leaves a facility at which the patient is receiving care to obtain the patient's consent to disclose the patient's individualized mental health safety plan with mental health providers, integrated school based mental health providers, and mental health community paramedicine programs that will be supporting the patient's safe transition back into the community and, if applicable, school. Provides that if a licensed mental health professional or paramedic determines that a patient may be a harm to himself or herself or others, the mental health professional or paramedic may request a patient's individualized safety plan. Provides that each psychiatric crisis center, psychiatric inpatient unit, and psychiatric residential treatment provider shall, upon request and without the consent of the patient, share a patient's individualized mental safety to a mental health professional or paramedic who demonstrate proof of licensure and commit to protecting the information in compliance with privacy laws. Provides that a psychiatric crisis center, psychiatric inpatient unit, or psychiatric residential treatment provider that discloses an individualized mental health safety plan to certain licensed providers in good faith is immune from civil and criminal liability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Individualized mental health safety plans. Requires the division of mental health and addiction to establish a standard format for individualized mental health safety plans. Requires psychiatric crisis centers, psychiatric inpatient units, and psychiatric residential treatment providers to: (1) collaboratively develop a mental health safety plan with each patient; (2) explain the benefits of coordinating care and sharing mental health safety plans with mental health providers in the community that can help with the patient's safe transition back into the community; and (3) make a good faith effort before a patient leaves a facility at which the patient is receiving care to obtain the patient's consent to disclose the patient's individualized mental health safety plan with mental health providers, integrated school based mental health providers, and mental health community paramedicine programs that will be supporting the patient's safe transition back into the community and, if applicable, school. Provides that if a licensed mental health professional or paramedic determines that a patient may be a harm to himself or herself or others, the mental health professional or paramedic may request a patient's individualized safety plan. Provides that each psychiatric crisis center, psychiatric inpatient unit, and psychiatric residential treatment provider shall, upon request and without the consent of the patient, share a patient's individualized mental safety to a mental health professional or paramedic who demonstrate proof of licensure and commit to protecting the information in compliance with privacy laws. Provides that a psychiatric crisis center, psychiatric inpatient unit, or psychiatric residential treatment provider that discloses an individualized mental health safety plan to certain licensed providers in good faith is immune from civil and criminal liability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-05SenatePublic Law 225
2019-05-05SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-24HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-18SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-17SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 524: yeas 46, nays 0
2019-04-15SenateMotion to concur filed
2019-04-11HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-04-09HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 438: yeas 95, nays 0
2019-04-08HouseRepresentatives Bacon, Shackleford, Beck added as cosponsors
2019-04-08HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-04-04HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2019-02-27SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-26SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Kirchhofer
2019-02-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 230: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-02-25SenateAmendment #1 (Crider) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-25SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-02-12SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-02-11SenateSenators Merritt, Ruckelshaus, Leising added as coauthors
2019-02-11SenateSenator Becker added as third author
2019-02-11SenateSenator Charbonneau added as second author
2019-02-11SenateSenator Becker removed as coauthor
2019-02-07SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-14SenateSenator Becker added as coauthor
2019-01-10SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2019-01-10SenateAuthored by Senator Crider

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/359/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/a/e/5/8ae5cdd9/SB0359.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/4/1/d541d3ef/SB0359.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/7/f/f/57ff7fc6/SB0359.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/f/1/30f1adac/SB0359.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/5/5/a755f51e/SB0359.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/1/4/0/3140cc48/SB0359.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/0/4/7d04e255/SB0359.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/9/8/fc980365/SB0359.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/a/7/3/fa731902/SB0359.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/0/7/250760e3/SB0359.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/8/7/c287c1ac/SB0359.230.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/6/f/e/96fe3ad8/SB0359.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/8/a/388a6ddc/SB0359.438.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/e/0/91e09632/SB0359.524.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback