IN SB0353 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions
Pending: House Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions
Pending: House Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Funding of lawsuits. Establishes a procedure by which a company may provide funding to the plaintiff in an action in exchange for the contingent right to receive a part of the potential proceeds of the action. Requires a company that offers funding to plaintiffs to register with the attorney general.
Title
Funding of lawsuits. Establishes a procedure by which a company may provide funding to the plaintiff in an action in exchange for the contingent right to receive a part of the potential proceeds of the action. Requires a company that offers funding to plaintiffs to register with the attorney general.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Lehman |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 114: yeas 47, nays 3 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senator Young, M. added as second author |
2016-01-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Authored by Senator Head |