IN SB0322 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Second reading: engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Second reading: engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that an eligible school may be accredited by the state board of education or a national or regional accreditation agency that meets the standards adopted by the state board of education. Provides that the department of education may not require a school that is eligible to receive choice scholarships and accredited by a national or regional accreditation agency recognized by the state board of education to report any information that is not necessary to determine the school's eligibility to participate in the choice scholarship program.
Title
Schools receiving choice scholarships.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education and Career Development - Roll Call 032201 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Education and Career Development |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Schneider, Banks |