IN SB0316 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Clark County study commission. Establishes the Clark County tax leadership commission (commission). Requires the commission to: (1) study the structure and operation of each existing tax increment financing district in Clark County; (2) study the impact of tax increment financing districts on county government, municipal government, schools, libraries, public safety, and fire protection districts in Clark County; (3) study the overall tax structure of Clark County in order to make recommendations to stabilize the future fiscal circumstances for all Clark County local governmental units; (4) study the public services and infrastructure needs for potential population growth in Clark County as
Title
Clark County study commission. Establishes the Clark County tax leadership commission (commission). Requires the commission to: (1) study the structure and operation of each existing tax increment financing district in Clark County; (2) study the impact of tax increment financing districts on county government, municipal government, schools, libraries, public safety, and fire protection districts in Clark County; (3) study the overall tax structure of Clark County in order to make recommendations to stabilize the future fiscal circumstances for all Clark County local governmental units; (4) study the public services and infrastructure needs for potential population growth in Clark County as
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Representative Rhoads added as sponsor |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 147: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Smith J) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senator Kenley added as second author |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Smith J |