IN SB0316 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the department of education, in collaboration with organizations that have expertise in dating violence, domestic violence, and sexual abuse, to develop or identify model dating violence educational materials and a model for dating violence response policies and reporting. Requires the department to make the model dating violence educational materials and model for dating violence response policies developed or identified available to assist schools with the implementation of dating violence education programs for grades 6 through 12 and dating violence response polices by July 1, 2011.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dating violence.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-25 Effective 07/01/2010
2010-03-25 Public Law 83
2010-03-18 Signed by the Governor
2010-03-16 Signed by the President of the Senate
2010-03-11 Signed by the Speaker
2010-03-10 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2010-03-04 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 270: Yeas 45, Nays 5
2010-03-04 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 298: Yeas 82, Nays 14
2010-03-04 Rules suspended
2010-03-04 Conference committee report 2 : filed in the House
2010-03-02 House advisors appointed: VanDenburgh and Behning
2010-03-02 House conferees appointed: Porter and Clere
2010-03-02 Senate advisor appointed: Bray and Lanane
2010-03-02 Senate conferee appointed: Kruse and Rogers
2010-03-01 Senate dissented from House amendments
2010-02-25 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2010-02-25 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 250: Yeas 66, Nays 31
2010-02-23 Amendment 6 (Thompson), failed; Voice Vote
2010-02-23 Amendment 5 (Porter), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-23 Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
2010-02-16 Amendment 1 (Riecken), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-16 Second reading: amended, call withdrawn
2010-02-11 Representative VanDenburgh added as cosponsor
2010-02-11 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-02-08 First reading: referred to Committee on Education
2010-02-02 Senators Lanane and Simpson added as coauthors
2010-02-02 Cosponsor: Rep. Behning
2010-02-02 House sponsor: Rep. Porter
2010-02-02 Referred to the House
2010-02-02 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 147: Yeas 41 and Nays 8
2010-02-01 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-01-28 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-01-21 Senator Kruse added as second author
2010-01-11 First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2010-01-11 Authored by Senator Rogers

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback