IN SB0312 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Public Law 210
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Public Law 210
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Use of criminal history information in hiring. Provides that a political subdivision may not prohibit an employer from obtaining or using criminal history information during the hiring process to the extent allowed by federal or state law, rules, or regulations. Provides that a political subdivision may not prohibit an employer, at the time an individual makes an initial application for employment, from making an inquiry regarding the individual's criminal history information or requiring the individual to disclose criminal history information. Provides that criminal history information concerning an employee or former employee may not be introduced against an employer, an employer's
Title
Use of criminal history information in hiring. Provides that a political subdivision may not prohibit an employer from obtaining or using criminal history information during the hiring process to the extent allowed by federal or state law, rules, or regulations. Provides that a political subdivision may not prohibit an employer, at the time an individual makes an initial application for employment, from making an inquiry regarding the individual's criminal history information or requiring the individual to disclose criminal history information. Provides that criminal history information concerning an employee or former employee may not be introduced against an employer, an employer's
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | Senate | Public Law 210 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-03-29 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2017-03-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 339: yeas 79, nays 12 |
2017-03-27 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-23 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-03-13 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senator Perfect added as second author |
2017-02-21 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Leonard |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 156: yeas 38, nays 10 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Perfect) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boots |