IN SB0268 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
Pending: House Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
Pending: House Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Colorectal cancer screening coverage. Specifies services to be included as part of a covered colorectal cancer screening for policies of accident and sickness insurance and health maintenance organization (HMO) contracts. Defines "follow-up colonoscopy". Provides that a policy of accident and sickness insurance or HMO contract must cover: (1) a colorectal cancer screening test assigned either an "A" or "B" grade by the United States Preventive Services Task Force; and (2) A follow up colonoscopy if the result of a non-invasive colorectal cancer screening test with an "A" or "B" grade from the United States Preventive Services Task Force is positive. Provides that a high deductible health plan may impose a deductible requirement for a follow-up colonoscopy if these colorectal cancer screening requirements would be inconsistent with Internal Revenue Code provisions concerning high deductible health plans.
Title
Colorectal cancer screening coverage.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Sen. Andy Zay [R] | Sen. Scott Baldwin [R] | Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] |
Rep. Chris May [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senator Baldwin added as third author |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative May |
2022-01-20 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Carbaugh |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 35: yeas 44, nays 2 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Senator Zay added as second author |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bohacek |