IN SB0256 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Representative Moseley added as cosponsor
Pending: House Roads and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Work zones study. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the task of studying the use of automated traffic control systems in work zones.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Work zones study. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the task of studying the use of automated traffic control systems in work zones.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11HouseRepresentative Moseley added as cosponsor
2019-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2019-02-26SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-25SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-02-25SenateSenator Melton added as coauthor
2019-02-25SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Pressel
2019-02-25SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 185: yeas 47, nays 2
2019-02-21SenateSenator Crider added as second author
2019-02-21SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-19SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Ford Jon

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback