IN SB0244 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - Representative Davisson added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - Representative Davisson added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Hoosier business investment income tax credit.
Title
Hoosier business investment income tax credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | House | Representative Davisson added as cosponsor |
2013-03-19 | House | House Rule 105.1 suspended |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2013-03-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-03-12 | House | Representatives Heuer and Zent added as cosponsors |
2013-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senators Kruse, Grooms, Banks and Breaux added as coauthors |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Cosponsor: Rep. Stemler |
2013-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Thompson |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 60: yeas 44 and nays 4 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Senator Landske added as coauthor |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senator Skinner added as coauthor |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senator Hershman added as third author |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as second author |
2013-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Wyss |