IN SB0224 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Section 3 effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Section 3 effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the sentencing study policy committee to study and make recommendations regarding the sending of sexually suggestive or sexually explicit material over the Internet or by use of a cellular telephone or similar device. Provides that a school corporation may offer classes or instruction regarding the risks and consequences of creating and sharing sexually suggestive or sexually explicit materials electronically. Provides filing and notice requirements for a petition to remove a person's designation as a sex offender or to require the person to register under less restrictive conditions
Title
Electronic dissemination of indecent material and sex offender registration.
Sponsors
Sen. James Arnold [D] | Sen. Michael Delph [R] | Sen. Randall Head [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] |
Sen. Timothy Lanane [D] | Sen. James Merritt [R] | Sen. Thomas Wyss [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Section 3 effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Section 2 effective 03/24/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Section 1 effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Public Law 103 | |
2010-03-24 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-03-19 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-16 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2010-03-12 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2010-03-10 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 317: Yeas 95, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-05 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 279: Yeas 50, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-04 | Rules suspended | |
2010-03-04 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2010-03-02 | House advisors appointed: Blanton, Pryor, Leonard and Koch | |
2010-03-02 | House conferees appointed: L. Lawson and Culver | |
2010-03-02 | Senate advisors appointed: Head, Hume and Holdman | |
2010-03-02 | Senate conferee appointed: Merritt and Arnold | |
2010-03-02 | Senate dissented from House amendments | |
2010-02-25 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2010-02-25 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 244: Yeas 97, Nays 0 | |
2010-02-24 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-22 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-08 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-02-02 | Senators Wyss, Kruse and Lanane added as coauthors | |
2010-02-02 | Cosponsors: Reps. Blanton and Pryor | |
2010-02-02 | House sponsor: Rep. L. Lawson | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the House | |
2010-02-02 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 118: Yeas 50 and Nays 0 | |
2010-02-01 | Senator Head added as second author | |
2010-02-01 | Senator Head removed as coauthor | |
2010-02-01 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-28 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-21 | Senators Delph, Head and Arnold added as coauthors | |
2010-01-11 | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters | |
2010-01-11 | Authored by Senator Merritt |