IN SB0182 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Representative Judy added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicle matters. Provides that the bureau of motor vehicles (BMV) may develop a system to issue mobile credentials. Provides that the BMV may issue, upon request of an applicant, a mobile credential when the applicant satisfies the requirements for application for an identification card or various licenses and permits. Provides the BMV with rulemaking authority to implement the mobile credential system. Defines mobile credential. Makes conforming changes. Provides that an owner or last titled owner of a motor vehicle commits a Class C infraction when the owner or last titled owner of the motor vehicle abandons the vehicle. Provides that a unit or holder of a mechanic's lien including a towing service, city, town, or county shall forward a copy of the abandoned vehicle report including a copy of the complaint and summons to the public agency who placed the abandoned vehicle tag on the vehicle. Provides that the public agency shall send the complaint and summons by first class mail to the owner of the vehicle. Provides for the form for a complaint and summons for the offense of abandoning a vehicle. Provides a procedure to change the gender that appears on a driver's license, permit, identification card, or photo exempt identification card.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicle matters. Provides that the bureau of motor vehicles (BMV) may develop a system to issue mobile credentials. Provides that the BMV may issue, upon request of an applicant, a mobile credential when the applicant satisfies the requirements for application for an identification card or various licenses and permits. Provides the BMV with rulemaking authority to implement the mobile credential system. Defines mobile credential. Makes conforming changes. Provides that an owner or last titled owner of a motor vehicle commits a Class C infraction when the owner or last titled owner of the motor vehicle abandons the vehicle. Provides that a unit or holder of a mechanic's lien including a towing service, city, town, or county shall forward a copy of the abandoned vehicle report including a copy of the complaint and summons to the public agency who placed the abandoned vehicle tag on the vehicle. Provides that the public agency shall send the complaint and summons by first class mail to the owner of the vehicle. Provides for the form for a complaint and summons for the offense of abandoning a vehicle. Provides a procedure to change the gender that appears on a driver's license, permit, identification card, or photo exempt identification card.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25HouseRepresentative Judy added as cosponsor
2019-03-21HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2019-02-13SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-12SenateSenator Crane added as coauthor
2019-02-12SenateCosponsor: Representative Hatcher
2019-02-12SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Morris
2019-02-12SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 108: yeas 47, nays 1
2019-02-11SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-02-11SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-07SenateSenators Tallian, Breaux, Holdman, Bassler added as coauthors
2019-02-07SenateSenator Charbonneau added as third author
2019-02-07SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-29SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-14SenateSenator Doriot added as coauthor
2019-01-14SenateSenator Crider added as second author
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Melton

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/182/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/7/3/3673e630/SB0182.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/1/9/f9191b65/SB0182.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/b/2/5/bb25af9e/SB0182.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/7/2/2c72752c/SB0182.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/d/4/4/1d44663e/SB0182.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/0/6/e/a06edd10/SB0182.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/b/8/b2b8ec37/SB0182.04.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/a/c/b/bacb84e4/SB0182.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/4/2/ea421d64/SB0182.02.COMS.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/6/2/6/c626e11b/SB0182.108.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/c/c/0/acc07038/SB0182.03.COMS.00.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback