IN SB0167 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-21 - Senator Waterman added as coauthor.
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-21 - Senator Waterman added as coauthor.
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deletes provisions that prohibit volunteer firefighters from assuming or holding certain elected offices.
Title
Volunteer firefighters holding elected office.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senator Waterman added as coauthor. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senator Paul added as coauthor. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Senator Skinner added as coauthor. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Senator Young, R. Michael added as coauthor. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as coauthor. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as coauthor. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Senator Nugent added as coauthor. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Senator Hume added as coauthor. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as coauthor. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as coauthor. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Senator Glick added as third author. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Local Government |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as second author. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jean Leising. |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/senate/167/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/c/9/6/ac966cd6/SB0167.01.INTR.pdf |