IN SB0124 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Public Law 92
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Public Law 92
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Vending machine sales of food. Eliminates (effective July 1, 2019) the provision in current law that specifies that food sold through a vending machine is not eligible for the sales tax exemption for food and food ingredients for human consumption.
Title
Vending machine sales of food. Eliminates (effective July 1, 2019) the provision in current law that specifies that food sold through a vending machine is not eligible for the sales tax exemption for food and food ingredients for human consumption.
Sponsors
Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. Greg Walker [R] | Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. David Ober [R] | Rep. Gregory Porter [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Public Law 92 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 356: yeas 45, nays 0 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2018-03-06 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2018-03-05 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 303: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2018-02-28 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-26 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Porter |
2018-02-06 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Ober |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 161: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senator Walker added as second author |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Senator Messmer added as coauthor |
2018-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Holdman |