IN SB0112 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - Amendment 16 (Merritt), prevailed; Roll Call 138: yeas 27, nays 22
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - Amendment 16 (Merritt), prevailed; Roll Call 138: yeas 27, nays 22
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows an alcoholic beverage wholesaler to provide certain services to another alcoholic beverage wholesaler regarding any alcoholic beverage. Allows the alcohol and tobacco commission to adopt rules to establish terms and conditions that apply to the services.
Title
Alcoholic beverage wholesalers.
Sponsors
Sen. James Arnold [D] | Sen. Brandt Hershman [R] | Sen. James Merritt [R] | Sen. Brent Steele [R] |
Sen. Greg Taylor [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 16 (Merritt), prevailed (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | Amendment 16 (Merritt), prevailed; Roll Call 138: yeas 27, nays 22 | |
2011-02-17 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-24 | Senator Hershman added as coauthor | |
2011-01-20 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-18 | Senators Arnold and Taylor added as coauthors | |
2011-01-18 | Senator Steele added as second author | |
2011-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy | |
2011-01-05 | Authored by Senator Merritt |