IN SB0098 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Public Law 46
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Public Law 46
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Specialized driving privileges. Provides that an individual's specialized driving privileges expire at the time the suspension of the individual's driving privileges is terminated if: (1) the underlying conviction, charge, adjudication, or determination that forms the basis of the suspension is reversed, vacated, or dismissed; or (2) the individual is acquitted of, found not liable for, or otherwise found not to have committed the underlying act or offense that forms the basis of the suspension. Requires the court to inform the bureau of motor vehicles of a termination of a suspension and expiration of specialized driving privileges.
Title
Specialized driving privileges. Provides that an individual's specialized driving privileges expire at the time the suspension of the individual's driving privileges is terminated if: (1) the underlying conviction, charge, adjudication, or determination that forms the basis of the suspension is reversed, vacated, or dismissed; or (2) the individual is acquitted of, found not liable for, or otherwise found not to have committed the underlying act or offense that forms the basis of the suspension. Requires the court to inform the bureau of motor vehicles of a termination of a suspension and expiration of specialized driving privileges.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Blake Doriot [R] | Sen. David Niezgodski [D] | Rep. John Young [R] |
Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Public Law 46 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 274: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2018-02-27 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2018-02-26 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 213: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2018-02-22 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-20 | House | Representative Steuerwald added as cosponsor |
2018-02-20 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-19 | House | Representative Young J added as sponsor |
2018-02-19 | House | Representative Steuerwald removed as sponsor |
2018-02-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as third author |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as second author |
2018-01-16 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Steuerwald |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 15: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Young M |