IN SB0015 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the state department of health (state department) and the office of the secretary of family and social services (office) to study current brain injury services that are offered in Indiana, determine whether there are deficiencies in the services, and determine how to implement additional services and neurobehavioral rehabilitation programs in Indiana. Establishes an advisory committee to assist the state department and the office in the study. Requires the following to be provided to the health finance commission: (1) Information concerning the study of brain injury services in Indiana; and (2) Information concerning the feasibility and development of a risk based managed care pilot program for aged, blind, and disabled Medicaid recipients. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the health finance commission.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Brain injury services and Medicaid.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-08 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-19 Signed by the Governor
2012-03-12 Signed by the President of the Senate
2012-03-09 Signed by the Speaker
2012-03-09 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2012-03-08 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 320: yeas 47, nays 0
2012-03-08 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 365: yeas 92, nays 0
2012-03-08 Rules suspended
2012-03-07 Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House
2012-03-01 House advisors appointed: Karickhoff and Welch
2012-03-01 House conferees appointed: T. Brown and C. Brown
2012-02-29 Senate advisors appointed: Buck, Rogers and Becker
2012-02-29 Senate conferee appointed: Miller and Breaux
2012-02-29 Senate dissented from House amendments
2012-02-29 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2012-02-29 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 293: yeas 91, nays 0
2012-02-28 Amendment 6 (Reske), failed; voice vote
2012-02-28 Amendment 5 (T. Brown), prevailed; voice vote
2012-02-28 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2012-02-23 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-02-07 Representative Karickhoff added as cosponsor
2012-01-31 First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2012-01-23 Senator Buck added as coauthor
2012-01-23 Cosponsor: Rep. C. Brown
2012-01-23 House sponsor: Rep. T. Brown
2012-01-23 Referred to the House
2012-01-23 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 36: yeas 49 and nays 1
2012-01-17 Amendment 1 (Miller), prevailed;
2012-01-17 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2012-01-12 Senator Breaux added as third author
2012-01-12 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-01-04 First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2012-01-04 Authored by Senators Miller and Becker

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2012&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SB&docno=0015
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/IN/IN0015.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/SB/SB0015.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/SB/SB0015.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/ES/ES0015.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/ES/ES0015.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/SE/SE0015.1.html
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/PDF/Srollcal/0036.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/PDF/Hrollcal/0293.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/PDF/Srollcal/0320.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/PDF/Hrollcal/0365.PDF.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback