IN HR0047 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-15 - Representatives Culver, Price, Davisson, Bacon, Mahan, McMillin, Speedy, Arnold, Heaton, M. Smith, T. Brown, Niemeyer, McNamara, DeVon, Harman, VanNatter, Heuer, Richardson, Torr, Eberhart, Lehman, Mayfield, Lucas, Washburne, Lehe, Morrison, Messmer, Ubelhor, Clere, Behning, Friend, Frizzell, Pond, Hamm, Ziemke and Smaltz added as coauthors
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-15 - Representatives Culver, Price, Davisson, Bacon, Mahan, McMillin, Speedy, Arnold, Heaton, M. Smith, T. Brown, Niemeyer, McNamara, DeVon, Harman, VanNatter, Heuer, Richardson, Torr, Eberhart, Lehman, Mayfield, Lucas, Washburne, Lehe, Morrison, Messmer, Ubelhor, Clere, Behning, Friend, Frizzell, Pond, Hamm, Ziemke and Smaltz added as coauthors
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging national policy makers to increase U.S. energy security.
Title
Urging national policy makers to increase U.S. energy security.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | House | Representatives Culver, Price, Davisson, Bacon, Mahan, McMillin, Speedy, Arnold, Heaton, M. Smith, T. Brown, Niemeyer, McNamara, DeVon, Harman, VanNatter, Heuer, Richardson, Torr, Eberhart, Lehman, Mayfield, Lucas, Washburne, Lehe, Morrison, Messmer, Ubelhor, Clere, Behning, Friend, Frizzell, Pond, Hamm, Ziemke and Smaltz added as coauthors |
2013-04-11 | House | Representatives Burton, Frye and Ober added as coauthors |
2013-04-11 | House | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2013-04-04 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-03-25 | House | Representative Koch added as coauthor |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Utilities and Energy |
2013-03-19 | House | Authored by Representative Wolkins |