IN HCR0042 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - Representative V. Smith added as coauthor.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION honoring Dr. Frank A. Bush.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION honoring Dr. Frank A. Bush.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-25HouseRepresentative V. Smith added as coauthor.
2014-02-24SenateFirst reading: adopted voice vote
2014-02-20HouseSenator Kruse added as sponsor.
2014-02-20HouseFirst reading: adopted voice vote
2014-02-11HouseAuthored by Representative Goodin.

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback