IN HCR0019 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to honor First Lieutenant Clayton Robert Cullen by naming a portion of State Road 67 the "Lt. Clayton Robert Cullen Memorial Highway".
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to honor First Lieutenant Clayton Robert Cullen by naming a portion of State Road 67 the "Lt. Clayton Robert Cullen Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House - Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House - Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | Senate | Returned to the House |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-03-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2021-03-08 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Bassler |
2021-03-08 | House | Representative Hostettler added as coauthor |
2021-03-08 | House | Second reading: adopted Roll Call 242: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2021-03-04 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-03-01 | House | First reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2021-03-01 | House | Coauthored by Representative Borders |
2021-03-01 | House | Authored by Representative Goodrich |