IN HCR0014 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Private Richard Taylor & Lt. Colonel Don C. Faith, Jr.
Title
Honoring Private Richard Taylor & Lt. Colonel Don C. Faith, Jr.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - House - House - Second reading: adopted Roll Call 324: yeas 91, nays 0 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Returned to the House | |
2012-03-07 | Second reading: adopted voice vote | |
2012-03-06 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-03-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation and Veterans Affairs | |
2012-03-05 | Senate sponsor: Senator Waterman | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to the Senate | |
2012-03-05 | Second reading: adopted Roll Call 324: yeas 91, nays 0 | |
2012-02-23 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-07 | Referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation | |
2012-02-07 | Authored by Representative Messmer |