IN HB1540 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Public Law 255
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Various gaming matters. Specifies the process for entering into tribal-state compacts concerning Indian gaming. Authorizes riverboats to move inland to adjacent properties meeting certain requirements. Makes the promotional play deduction for riverboats and racinos permanent. Caps the number of gambling games offered by a licensed owner or an operating agent at the greatest number of gambling games offered since January 1, 2007, regardless of whether the licensed owner relocates gaming operations to an inland casino. Authorizes table games at the racinos beginning in 2021 if approved by the Indiana gaming commission. Provides for the use of AGR attributable to table

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various gaming matters. Specifies the process for entering into tribal-state compacts concerning Indian gaming. Authorizes riverboats to move inland to adjacent properties meeting certain requirements. Makes the promotional play deduction for riverboats and racinos permanent. Caps the number of gambling games offered by a licensed owner or an operating agent at the greatest number of gambling games offered since January 1, 2007, regardless of whether the licensed owner relocates gaming operations to an inland casino. Authorizes table games at the racinos beginning in 2021 if approved by the Indiana gaming commission. Provides for the use of AGR attributable to table

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 75 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Public Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 76 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House - Amendment #25 (Eberhart) prevailed (Y: 76 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House - Amendment #12 (Brown T) prevailed (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Committee on Public Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-12HousePublic Law 255
2015-05-12HouseBill Became Law on 8th Day Without Signature
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-05-01HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-29HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 586: yeas 75, nays 11
2015-04-29SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 566: yeas 36, nays 13
2015-04-20SenateSenate Advisors appointed: Alting, Rogers, Perfect, Leising and Messmer
2015-04-20SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Kenley and Lanane
2015-04-16HouseHouse Advisors appointed: Huston, Morrison, Wesco, GiaQuinta, Brown C and Summers
2015-04-16HouseHouse Conferees appointed: Dermody and Austin
2015-04-14HouseHouse dissented from Senate Amendments
2015-04-14HouseMotion to dissent filed
2015-04-10SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2015-04-09SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 406: yeas 36, nays 13
2015-04-07SenateAmendment #3 (Kenley) prevailed; voice vote
2015-04-07SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-04-02SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-03-19SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2015-03-19SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2015-03-16SenateSenator Lanane added as cosponsor
2015-03-02SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2015-02-26HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-02-25HouseSenator Arnold added as cosponsor
2015-02-25HouseSenator Rogers added as third sponsor
2015-02-25HouseSenator Kenley added as second sponsor
2015-02-25HouseSenator Alting added as sponsor
2015-02-25HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 263: yeas 76, nays 19
2015-02-24HouseAmendment #4 (Morrison) motion withdrawn
2015-02-24HouseAmendment #16 (Summers) motion withdrawn
2015-02-24HouseAmendment #25 (Eberhart) prevailed; Roll Call 227: yeas 76, nays 22
2015-02-24HouseAmendment #12 (Brown T) prevailed; Roll Call 226: yeas 96, nays 1
2015-02-24HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-02-19HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-02-12HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2015-02-12HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-22HouseRepresentative Austin added as coauthor
2015-01-20HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2015-01-20HouseCoauthored by Representatives Brown T and GiaQuinta
2015-01-20HouseAuthored by Representative Dermody

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/house/1540/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/5/a/605a7db8/HB1540.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/4/f/d/24fd1375/HB1540.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/9/7/a1976a42/HB1540.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/f/5/7cf5a963/HB1540.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/7/6/7/d76718eb/HB1540.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/9/b/889b39e3/HB1540.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/4/d/1/34d1d86c/HB1540.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/2/d/232dab97/HB1540.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/c/3/80c329a8/HB1540.05.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/e/0/cee031f9/HB1540.05.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/3/f/ee3fee08/HB1540.06.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/f/7/2/cf721da2/HB1540.06.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/f/3/2/ef32d394/HB1540.07.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/c/6/cac61f5d/HB1540.07.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/9/e/029e2565/HB1540.08.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/5/8/4258cf1d/HB1540.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/a/4/e/2a4e733a/HB1540.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/3/b/e/63be2833/HB1540.226.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/0/6/2706741d/HB1540.227.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/6/3/b76341d5/HB1540.263.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/4/8/b248e3df/HB1540.04.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/5/6/59563815/HB1540.05.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/1/8/f/c18f5806/HB1540.406.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/2/6/1/72619074/HB1540.586.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/f/4/26f4e59c/HB1540.566.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback