IN HB1531 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 213
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 213
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
DCS and the education community. Defines "exigent circumstances" for purposes of action taken by the department of child services (DCS) with respect to a child. Allows DCS to interview a child at the child's school, except for at a nonaccredited nonpublic school with less than one employee, without parental consent if: (1) the DCS employee presents their credentials upon arrival at the school; and (2) DCS presents a written statement that DCS has parental consent, a court order, or exigent circumstances. Requires that the written statement shall not be maintained in the child's file and must protect the child's and child's family's confidentiality. Mandates that DCS provide assurances that the child's school, or its representative, has been invited to participate in the case plan process.
Title
DCS and the education community.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale DeVon [R] | Rep. Anthony Cook [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Rowray [R] | Rep. Carolyn Jackson [D] |
Sen. Erin Houchin [R] | Sen. Stacey Donato [R] | Sen. David Niezgodski [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 66 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 11 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 80 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 11 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 80 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Public Law 213 |
2021-04-29 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-04-15 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 453: yeas 66, nays 23 |
2021-04-14 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 429: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 406: yeas 11, nays 39 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Houchin) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senator Donato added as second sponsor |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as cosponsor |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-03-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2021-02-22 | House | Representative Jackson added as coauthor |
2021-02-22 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Houchin |
2021-02-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 206: yeas 80, nays 15 |
2021-02-18 | House | Amendment #2 (DeVon) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-02-18 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-02-09 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2021-01-14 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Cook and Rowray |
2021-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative DeVon |