IN HB1516 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Public Law 258
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Domestic violence fatality review committee. Removes the limit on the authority of a local domestic violence review team (local review team) to the review of fatalities when the person who commits domestic violence resulting in death is charged with a criminal offense that results in a final judgment or is deceased. Specifies that local review teams may review near fatalities. Establishes the statewide domestic violence fatality review committee (committee). Imposes various duties upon the committee, including to: (1) assist local review teams; (2) assist in or conduct a review of a death or near fatality in possible domestic violence cases;

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic violence fatality review committee. Removes the limit on the authority of a local domestic violence review team (local review team) to the review of fatalities when the person who commits domestic violence resulting in death is charged with a criminal offense that results in a final judgment or is deceased. Specifies that local review teams may review near fatalities. Establishes the statewide domestic violence fatality review committee (committee). Imposes various duties upon the committee, including to: (1) assist local review teams; (2) assist in or conduct a review of a death or near fatality in possible domestic violence cases;

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-11 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HousePublic Law 258
2017-04-28HouseSigned by the Governor
2017-04-25SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-20SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-19HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-11HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 469: yeas 89, nays 0
2017-04-11HouseMotion to concur filed
2017-03-31SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2017-03-30SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 331: yeas 49, nays 0
2017-03-28SenateAmendment #2 (Crider) prevailed; voice vote
2017-03-28SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-03-27SenateSenator Lanane added as cosponsor
2017-03-21SenateSenator Bray added as second sponsor
2017-03-20SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2017-03-16SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-02-23SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-22HouseReferred to the Senate
2017-02-21HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Crider
2017-02-21HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 182: yeas 96, nays 0
2017-02-20HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-02-16HouseRepresentative Lawson added as coauthor
2017-02-16HouseRepresentatives Bacon and Schaibley added as coauthors
2017-02-16HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-18HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2017-01-18HouseAuthored by Representative Olthoff

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/house/1516/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/5/2/ad528321/HB1516.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/1/5/a/f15a20dd/HB1516.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/e/a/b/3eabd376/HB1516.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/0/0/02000254/HB1516.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/8/6/e7866762/HB1516.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/e/8/2be85518/HB1516.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/7/5/da75b370/HB1516.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/c/e/e6ce0bf4/HB1516.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/e/d/9/3ed96c21/HB1516.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/3/7/e/837e6495/HB1516.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/3/4/8/5348bea9/HB1516.182.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/7/e/eb7e6773/HB1516.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/5/5/9e55b9d9/HB1516.331.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/f/1/ddf19e21/HB1516.469.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback