IN HB1511 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Public Law 157
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Public Law 157
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Liens on abandoned or towed vehicles. Adds state agencies to the definition of "public agency". Broadens the application of IC 9-22-1-23 to include all holders of mechanic's liens. Requires that additional information be included in the notification to a person whose vehicle was towed to a storage yard or towing service. Specifies that a lienholder's failure to comply with certain notice requirements may result in civil damages. Provides that proof of receipt of notice for a mechanic's lien by the owner of a vehicle subject to the mechanic's lien is not required in certain instances. Provides that, if there is
Title
Liens on abandoned or towed vehicles. Adds state agencies to the definition of "public agency". Broadens the application of IC 9-22-1-23 to include all holders of mechanic's liens. Requires that additional information be included in the notification to a person whose vehicle was towed to a storage yard or towing service. Specifies that a lienholder's failure to comply with certain notice requirements may result in civil damages. Provides that proof of receipt of notice for a mechanic's lien by the owner of a vehicle subject to the mechanic's lien is not required in certain instances. Provides that, if there is
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Braun [R] | Rep. Timothy Brown [R] | Rep. Terry Goodin [D] | Rep. Chris May [R] |
Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | House | Public Law 157 |
2017-04-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 468: yeas 89, nays 0 |
2017-04-11 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 330: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Young M) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senator Taylor G added as cosponsor |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-23 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Messmer and Ford |
2017-02-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 223: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2017-02-22 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-20 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-26 | House | Representative May added as coauthor |
2017-01-18 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-18 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Brown T and Goodin |
2017-01-18 | House | Authored by Representative Braun |