IN HB1507 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - First Reading: Referred to Committee on Commerce & Technology
Pending: Senate Commerce & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

State building commissioner. Requires the state building commissioner: (1) to have at least 10 years of experience in the building trades industry, at least five years of management experience, and a bachelor's degree in a construction related field; or (2) to have at least five years of industry experience, at least five years of management experience, and to be a registered or licensed architect or engineer or have a master's degree in a construction related field.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State building commissioner. Requires the state building commissioner: (1) to have at least 10 years of experience in the building trades industry, at least five years of management experience, and a bachelor's degree in a construction related field; or (2) to have at least five years of industry experience, at least five years of management experience, and to be a registered or licensed architect or engineer or have a master's degree in a construction related field.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 63 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Riecken) prevailed (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House Floor - (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-24SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Committee on Commerce & Technology
2015-02-03HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-02-02HouseSenator Yoder added as sponsor
2015-02-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 61: yeas 63, nays 33
2015-01-29HouseRepresentatives Riecken and Lucas added as coauthor
2015-01-29HouseAmendment #2 (Riecken) prevailed; Roll Call 48: yeas 88, nays 7
2015-01-29HouseAmendment #1 (Pelath) ruled out of order
2015-01-29HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-01-27HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-20HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2015-01-20HouseAuthored by Representative VanNatter

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback